U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02337
  • Case Name: Integrity Truck Sales, Inc. v. Jaber Leasing, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [ADR Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 24, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.