U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02336
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Alcon Vision, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • November 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.