U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03181
  • Case Name: Gilmore v. Easter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reopen Case]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 12, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.