U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03182
  • Case Name: Dobbs v. Messer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 28, 2022: [Martinez Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.