U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01194
  • Case Name: Rothermel v. Sedgwick County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Comparative Fault Designation]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time]
  • October 19, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 19, 2022: [Leave to File Out of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 15, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.