U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02338
  • Case Name: Sepulveda v. Kansas Car Finder, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.