U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01195
  • Case Name: Bolen v. Farm Bureau Financial Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.