U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03183
  • Case Name: Coles v. Hudson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • November 14, 2022: [Traverse]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Default Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 29, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.