U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02340
  • Case Name: SC Realty Services, LLC v. Saucedo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 30, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 19, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • September 08, 2022: [Return of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.