U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01196
  • Case Name: Blaurock v. Southwind Surgical Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sever]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Expedite]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection(s)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.