U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01197
  • Case Name: Ayers v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 30, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 30, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.