U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02341
  • Case Name: Freire v. Villas At Emporia, LLC, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Comparative Fault Designation]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • December 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 25, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.