U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02342
  • Case Name: Hergert v. Window Nation LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.