U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02343
  • Case Name: Delgado v. Kill Creek Post and Beam Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.