U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03186
  • Case Name: Harry v. Hudson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminating Referral Judge]
  • January 17, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • December 13, 2022: [Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 15, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.