U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02344
  • Case Name: Bain v. South Kansas and Oklahoma Railroad, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.