U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03185
  • Case Name: Riley (ID 52926) v. Skidmore et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Intervene]
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminating Referral Judge]
  • January 19, 2023: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • January 19, 2023: [Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal or Redact Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 16, 2022: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • December 16, 2022: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • December 16, 2022: [Martinez Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.