U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02345
  • Case Name: Thrush v. CNH Industrial America LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [ESI Protocol]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 19, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.