U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03188
  • Case Name: Dudley (ID 91359) v. Warren
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 24, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 23, 2023: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • January 23, 2023: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • January 23, 2023: [Martinez Report]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2022: [Relief from Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.