U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01199
  • Case Name: Lynch v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.