U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03187
  • Case Name: Barnett (ID 86695) v. Wichita Police Department, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 30, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.