U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02346
  • Case Name: Haugen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.