U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04046
  • Case Name: Leeds v. Allianz Risk Consulting, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 20, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.