U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01200
  • Case Name: Walker v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: [Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • October 04, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 20, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.