U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02347
  • Case Name: Admiral Insurance Company v. S&M Engineering, P.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.