U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03191
  • Case Name: Woods (ID 77647) v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • October 21, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.