U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02348
  • Case Name: American Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Cleaning Up, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.