U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02351
  • Case Name: Numen, LLC v. KC Float Spa, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.