U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02350
  • Case Name: Huffman v. Lennox Industries, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.