U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02352
  • Case Name: Wilmore v. Savvas Learning Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.