U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01203
  • Case Name: Interstate Group, L.L.C. v. Double Z's Trailers, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.