U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02353
  • Case Name: Fagg v. Valley Co-op, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 20, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.