U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03195
  • Case Name: Watts v. (lnu) et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.