U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01204
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Bartlett
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 05, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.