U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02355
  • Case Name: signature place kc, llc v. interstate fire & casualty company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.