U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02356
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.