U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03198
  • Case Name: May (ID 41527) v. Bunting et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 16, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 13, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.