U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03199
  • Case Name: Ahmed v. Donley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 10, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • November 10, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.