U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01206
  • Case Name: Dougan v. Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.