U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01205
  • Case Name: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Burkhart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 15, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.