U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02360
  • Case Name: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.