U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02359
  • Case Name: Cirkic v. Lambert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.