U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01207
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Credit Acceptance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 15, 2022: [Supplement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 15, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.