U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01208
  • Case Name: Busby v. Hansen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 20, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.