U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02361
  • Case Name: Tank Connection, LLC v. TRUMPF, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • November 11, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Index of Exhibits]
  • September 19, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 12, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.