U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02362
  • Case Name: Hulsing v. Larimer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 11, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 13, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.