U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02364
  • Case Name: McCrary v. ADT Solar, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.