U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03203
  • Case Name: Lawrence v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Stay Case]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.