U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02365
  • Case Name: Clark v. 10 Roads Express
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Issued]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sealed Document - use ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • September 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.