U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02366
  • Case Name: Roberts et al v. Caskey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 13, 2022: [Strike]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 11, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.